HI SB225 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB225
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers, mutual benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage beginning 1/1/2018 for medically necessary cognitive rehabilitation therapy for survivors of traumatic brain injury. Requires coverage for up to twenty years from the date the traumatic brain injury occurred and imposes a lifetime cap of $300,000 per person. Requests the auditor to update the 2004 auditor's report on cognitive rehabilitation and report back to the legislature. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health Coverage For Brain Injuries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 59) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB225 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB392 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB392 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2