HI SB226 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act 221, 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1322).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act 221, 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1322).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the definition of "business day" to the offense of abuse of a family or household member. Repeals the 48-hour no contact provision and specifies that the period of separation a police officer orders for the person whom the police officer reasonably believes to have inflicted the abuse of a family or household member commences when the order is issued and expires at 6:00 p.m. on the second business day following the day the order was issued. (SB226 SD2 HD1)
Title
Abuse of a Family or Household Member; No Contact Order
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Act 221, 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1322). |
2015-07-10 | House | Act 221, on 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1322). |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-22 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 650). |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-15. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-22-15. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-16-15 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 492). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1490) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 87) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 587) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-23-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 293) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB164 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1