HI SB226 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB226
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for youth suicide early intervention, prevention, and education initiatives in Kauai, Hawaii, and Maui counties. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Suicide Prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 74) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 736) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 189) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |