HI SB226 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB226
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the governor to negotiate land exchanges to acquire lands suitable for long-term diversified agricultural production in return for state lands to be developed for affordable, workforce, and other housing. Requires legislative approval for the land exchanges. Report to the Legislature. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Land Exchange.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to AGR/HSG, WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 172) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 796) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 329) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads, Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 1:15PM in conference room 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB226 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to AGR/HSG, WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22