HI SB2261 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 264, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1367).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 264, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1367).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation for the Weed and Seed Program for fiscal year 2012-2013 to maintain the current operation of the Program in areas currently designated for the Program. (CD1)
Title
Weed and Seed Program; DLIR; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 264, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1367). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 264, on 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1367). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-04 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 728). | |
2012-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 839). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 163-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 163-12). | |
2012-04-30 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Hee, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. | |
2012-04-30 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Rhoads, Har, Cullen, Cabanilla, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-30 | (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 829). | |
2012-04-30 | (S) Senator(s) Ige added as Co-Chair(s). | |
2012-04-29 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-30-12 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 12:45PM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 1:00PM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-12 3:00PM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-12 3:00PM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 755). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Hee, Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Aquino, Rhoads, Har, Cullen Co-Chairs; Cabanilla, Fontaine. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 428). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1561-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Jordan, Ward. | |
2012-03-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-12 3:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1269-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Cabanilla, Herkes. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-21-12 2:15PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from PBM/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1064-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Souki. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Luke, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Souki. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM/LAB on Thursday, 03-15-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to PBM/LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 127). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) One Day Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2727) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) Reported from PGM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2061) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-12 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to PGM/JDL, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2773 (Same As) 2012-03-23 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.