HI SB2264 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows patients the opportunity to designate a lay caregiver upon entry to a hospital. Establishes hospital requirements regarding lay caregivers, including designation of a lay caregiver, notification to a lay caregiver, and a discharge plan for patients. Provides immunity to hospitals and their employees regarding lay caregiving. Appropriates funds for the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation to implement lay caregiving in its facilities. Effective July 1, 2150. (SB2264 HD1)
Title
Lay Caregiver; After-care; Discharge Plan
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1164-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Oshiro. |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-19-14 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-03-11 | House | Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 136) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2701) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-26-14 11:15AM in conference room 16. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2079) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-14 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HTH, JDL. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2055 (Same As) 2014-01-31 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.