HI SB2264 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of days by which students must apply for free or reduced lunch and replenish the student's meal fund. Prohibits serving an alternative meal to students solely for failure to pay within thirty days of the first semester of a school year or thirty days after the student's meal fund account reaches a zero or negative balance. Prohibits a school from publicly identifying or stigmatizing a student who is unable to pay for a school meal. Requires the department of education to use moneys from the special school lunch fund to provide school meals. Appropriates funds into and out of the special school lunch fund. Requires the department of education to report to the Legislature regarding the number of students who are denied meals based on the inability to pay. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD1)
Title
Relating To School Lunch Reform.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1148-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Quinlan, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, DeCoite. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Wednesday, 03-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 178) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3124) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-11-20 10:40AM in conference room 211. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2304) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |