HI SB2282 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) The committee on EDH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) The committee on EDH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a two-year pilot project within a designated complex area, authorizing the complex area superintendent to reallocate resources within the schools in the complex area to achieve greater efficiency and cost-effectiveness. Requires interim and final reports to the legislature.
Title
Education; Complex Areas; Pilot Project
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee on EDH deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH deferred the measure until 02-10-10 1:20pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-10 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2282&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2282_.HTM |