HI SB2282 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the agricultural enforcement program and agricultural enforcement special fund within the Department of Agriculture. Authorizes the Board of Agriculture and agricultural enforcement officers to exercise police powers. Extends to the agricultural enforcement program the applicability of certain statutory provisions relating to the law enforcement officer independent review board; possession of electric guns; the law enforcement standards board; emergency vehicles; and worker's compensation for volunteer emergency response personnel. Authorizes the use of funds in the agricultural development and food security special fund for protection of agricultural resources. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-11-20 9:05AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 188) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3354) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-20 1:10PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2783) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-20 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM/JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2189 (Same As) 2020-01-31 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Agricultural Enforcement Program
Agricultural Enforcement Special Fund
Appropriation ($)
HDOA
Law Enforcement
Agricultural Enforcement Special Fund
Appropriation ($)
HDOA
Law Enforcement