HI SB2294 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the criteria for licensure of midwives by the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs. Provides for interim rules for continuing education requirements, standards of professional conduct, prescriptive authority, and penalties for violations. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The Licensure Of Midwives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDC, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2184 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2294&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2294_.HTM |