HI SB2307 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a parole hearing and validated risk assessment for prisoners who have not been released upon completion of a set minimum term or received an earlier release date. Permits supervised release on parole eighteen months prior to the expiration of the maximum term for class A felonies, twelve months prior to the expiration of the maximum term for class B felonies, and six months prior to the expiration of the maximum term for class C felonies. Permits the paroling authority to deny supervised parole prior to the expiration of a maximum sentence for certain offenders.
Title
Parole Hearing; Supervised Release; Risk Assessment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2106) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 01-30-14 3:45PM in conference room 224. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-14 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2307&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2307_.HTM |