HI SB2327 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a general excise tax exemption for medical services after December 31, 2019.
Title
Relating To The General Excise Tax Exemptions.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1913 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2327&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2327_.HTM |