HI SB2368 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist Pelatron Power Evolution LLC with the development of renewable energy power plants within the State.
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Pelatron Power Evolution LLC; Waste-to-Energy Power; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2592 (Same As) 2016-02-09 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2368&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2368_.HTM |