HI SB2369 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to LAB/HUS, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to LAB/HUS, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides emergency, nonrecurring, benefits for victims of domestic or sexual violence and expands current provisions for unemployment insurance, emergency leaves of absence, and insurance protections. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Domestic Violence Omnibus
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to LAB/HUS, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 137) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Bunda, Nishihara). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2628) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda. | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO deferred the measure until 02-25-10 11:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from LBR/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2313) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hee. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR/HMS has rescheduled its public hearing to 2/9/2010 3:30:00 PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-10 3:30pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Referred to LBR/HMS, JGO. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |