HI SB2375 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - (H) Act 113, on 6/15/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - (H) Act 113, on 6/15/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines agricultural-based commercial operations and authorizes agricultural-based commercial operations in agricultural districts. Includes agricultural-based commercial operations under the definition of "farming operation" in the Hawaii Right to Farm Act. (CD1)
Title
Land Use; Agricultural-Based Commercial Operations; Farming Operation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | (H) Act 113, on 6/15/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215). | |
2012-06-15 | (S) Act 113, 6/15/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Riviere voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Thielen voting no (2) and none excused (0). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 19-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 19-12). | |
2012-04-25 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, McKelvey, Chang, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-12 9:30AM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-12 9:30AM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 752). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Dela Cruz, Co-Chair(s); Wakai, Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Tsuji, McKelvey, Chang Co-Chairs; Har, Riviere. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Deferred until 04-12-12. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 379). | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Thielen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-05-12. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1502-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Coffman, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 03-30-12 11:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLO with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from AGR/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1259-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLO. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-21-12 9:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) The committee(s) on AGR/ERB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-12. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/ERB on Friday, 03-16-12 10:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Referred to AGR/ERB, WLO, referral sheet 42 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 414) in amended form (SD 3). | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Kidani, Ryan). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-12. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report filed. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Separated Committee Report. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Floor Amendment No. 5 offered. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2466) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-12 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WLH. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2291) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WLH. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Kouchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Tokuda. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-14-12 2:50PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-12 2:50PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to AGL, WLH. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |