HI SB2376 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits advertisements for massage, relaxation, spa, escort, or body rubs from including images depicting any person being advertised as a massage therapist, relaxation therapist, or escort in a nude or semi-nude condition. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD1)
Title
Cybertrafficking; Indecent Advertising
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2358) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-11-14 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1927 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3