HI SB2380 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning on January 1, 2016, requires an individual to "opt-out" of registering to vote on the affidavit on application for voter registration, to be included in the application for a driver's license and a civil identification card. Makes an appropriation. (SD1)
Title
Voter Registration; Driver's License; Civil Identification Card; Opt-out; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2271) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-14 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |