HI SB2398 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 9:30AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 9:30AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a collective bargaining unit for graduate student assistants employed by the University of Hawaii. Delays formation of the graduate student assistant collective bargaining unit until 7/1/2017. (SB2398 HD2)
Title
Collective Bargaining; Graduate Student Assistants; University of Hawaii
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 10:35AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) McDermott replaced Representative(s) Matsumoto as conferee(s). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Taniguchi, English Co-Chairs; Dela Cruz, K.Kahele. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Choy, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Matsumoto. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 532). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1708-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:31PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1252-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ing, Ohno, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Kong, Takumi, Tupola. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1109-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2016-03-15 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-15-16 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 159) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kidani, Kim, Nishihara, Wakai . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2694) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Inouye, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Wakai ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from JDL/HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2324) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDL/HEA, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1940 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to JDL/HEA, WAM.