HI SB2407 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Hemmings.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Hemmings.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an electricity bill reduction for residential electrical meters on islands where renewable electric energy is generated and exported. (SD1)
Title
Renewable Energy; Revenue Sharing; Electric Bill Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-10 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2079) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Hooser, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Ihara, Kokubun. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 3:00pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to ENE, CPN. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |