HI SB241 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the conference center revolving fund within the University of Hawaii at Manoa instead of within the college of continuing education and community service at the University of Hawaii at Manoa. Provides flexibility in the use of the revolving funds.
Title
University of Hawaii; Conference Center Revolving Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee on EDU deferred the measure. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1324 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=241 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB241_.HTM |