HI SB241 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB241
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the DOT to conduct a study to determine whether the Honolulu International Airport should participate in the screening partnership program of the Transportation Security Administration. Requires a report to legislature.
Title
Relating To Airport Screening.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 381) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, English, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-09-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deferred the measure until 02-08-17 1:40PM in conference room 225. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-07-17 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB241 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=241&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB241_.HTM |