HI SB242 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that compensation of vice principals of adult and community education schools be payable over a twelve-month period without proration. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Education; Adult and Community Education; Vice Principals
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 118) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-01-13 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 01-30-13 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |