HI SB2423 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-28 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-28 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows schools and classes to participate in fundraising or charitable activities, in conjunction with a charitable organization that is a 501(c)(3) tax-exempt organization and registered under section 467B-2.1, HRS, or granted an exception from registration under section 467B-11.5, HRS, based on criteria established by the board of education. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Department of Education; Fundraising and Charitable Activities
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-28-14 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takai, Tokioka excused (2). |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 999-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-12 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Awana, Choy, Ichiyama, Say, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Takai. |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-12-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 185) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2805) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2369) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-14 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |