HI SB2427 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits large trucks from being driven in the far left lane of any roadway having three or more lanes of traffic proceeding in the same direction.
Title
Statewide Traffic Code; Driving on Right Side of Roadway; Large Trucks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-08-10 2:00pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to TIA. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2427&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2427_.HTM |