HI SB243 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires retail dealers with more than seventy-five thousand square feet of retail space to operate redemption centers. Effective 10/1/2009.
Title
Deposit Beverage Container Program; HI-5; Retail Dealer; Redemption Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-19 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-19-09 10:30 am in conference room 325. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-19-09. | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-17-09 8:30 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to EEP, EBM, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 128). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Galuteria). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) One Day Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 725) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH will hold a public decision making on 03-04-09 3:00 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to HTH. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 233) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to HTH. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Hooser, Kokubun. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-09 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to ENE, HTH. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |