HI SB243 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB243
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii state energy office to develop a strategic plan that identifies strategies to achieve a resilient, clean energy, decarbonized economy as quickly as practicable and to submit the strategic plan to the legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the Regular Session of 2023. Requires the Hawaii natural energy institute to conduct a feasibility study of the strategic plan and to submit its findings and recommendations to the legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the regular sessions of 2023, 2028, 2033, 2043, and 2048. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1487) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1011) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 177) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 946) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-02-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 173) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB243 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Energy
Feasibility Study
Hawaii Natural Energy Institute
Hawaii State Energy Office
Renewable Energy
Strategic Plan
Feasibility Study
Hawaii Natural Energy Institute
Hawaii State Energy Office
Renewable Energy
Strategic Plan