HI SB2434 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:45pm in Conference Room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:45pm in Conference Room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes additional duties for the Alzheimer's Disease and Related Dementia Services Coordinator and appropriates funds for one full-time (1.00 FTE) position within the Executive Office on Aging to assist the Coordinator with Alzheimer's disease and dementia-related services. Effective July 1, 2150. (SB2434 HD1)
Title
Alzheimer's Disease and Related Dementia Services; Executive Office on Aging; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:45pm in Conference Room 016. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:45 PM in Conference Room 229. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 2:45PM in Conference Room 229. |
2014-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-17 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-22-14 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-17-14 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Fukumoto Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Green, Taniguchi, Slom Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 572). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1636-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-03-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4). |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 945-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-10 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Oshiro. |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Monday, 03-10-14 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 189) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2752) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2197) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-14 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |