HI SB2438 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that a disclaimer be provided by sellers or providers of emotional support animals or certificates, identifications, tags, vests, leashes, and harnesses for emotional support animals that the animal is not a service animal. Establishes penalties. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Service Animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2103) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN, JDC/WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPN, JDC/WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1944 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to HHH, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3