HI SB2439 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Act 238, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Act 238, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the statute of limitations for civil actions brought by persons subjected to sexual offenses as an adult against the person who committed the act. Allows a claim to be brought against legal entities during the two-year window period if there is a finding of gross negligence. Authorizes a court to award attorney's fees to a defendant when an accusation of sexual abuse was made with no basis in fact and with malicious intent. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Limitation Of Actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-09 | Senate | Act 238, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343). |
2024-07-09 | House | Act 238, on 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343). |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-24 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2024-06-21 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2024-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 119-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 119-24). |
2024-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Nishimoto, Holt, Ichiyama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 1:45PM; CR 325. |
2024-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 803). |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-24 5:00PM; Conference Room 325. |
2024-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Holt, Ichiyama, Souza. |
2024-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 722). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Elefante, Awa. |
2024-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 489). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 561). |
2024-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Souza excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1760-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-28 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Aiu, Cochran, Lamosao. |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4). |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1181-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-12 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 119) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, San Buenaventura. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2761) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 9:30AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |