HI SB2442 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an alternate power of sale process for condominium and planned community associations. Revises provisions on condominium liens for unpaid assessments and establishes similar provisions for planned community associations. Specifies the jurisdiction of the circuit courts over actions to foreclose association liens.
Title
Condominiums and Planned Community Associations; Liens for Unpaid Assessments; Collection and Foreclosure Remedies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-10-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Re-Referred to CPN, JDL. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to CPN/JDL, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2442 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2442_.HTM |