HI SB2462 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the functions of the State Health Planning and Development Agency. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Establishes positions. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To The State Health Planning And Development Agency.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] |
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Health
Expenditure Ceiling
Functions
Positions
State Health Planning and Development Agency
Department of Health
Expenditure Ceiling
Functions
Positions
State Health Planning and Development Agency
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2462&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2462_.HTM |