HI SB2492 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Ching, Fontaine, Hanohano, Johanson, Jordan, Luke, Marumoto, Pine, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Chang, Har voting no (2) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Ching, Fontaine, Hanohano, Johanson, Jordan, Luke, Marumoto, Pine, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Chang, Har voting no (2) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires specified persons who own, control, or have custody or control of ten or more covered dogs to ensure the proper treatment and care of dogs and the dogs' offspring. Prohibits any person from owning or having custody of more than thirty dogs. Requires specified persons to maintain specific records for each dog for at least three years following the death of the covered dog or a date on which the person permanently ceased to have possession or control of the dog. Prohibits certain types of dogs in the same enclosure. Establishes penalties. Effective January 7, 2059. (SB2492 HD1)
Title
Animal Cruelty; Dog Breeders
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Ching, Fontaine, Hanohano, Johanson, Jordan, Luke, Marumoto, Pine, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Chang, Har voting no (2) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1312-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Coffman, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, Ito, Luke. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision-making on Thursday, 03-22-12 2:15PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-22-12. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-13-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 199) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2452) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. | |
2012-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) Re-Referred to JDL. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to CPN, JDL. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |