HI SB2494 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures personal injury protection benefits remain consistent with prepaid health care plans by clearly specifying requirements for the reimbursement of drugs, supplies, and materials. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD1)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance; Personal Injury Protection Benefits; Reimbursement; Drugs, Supplies, and Materials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2132) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2584 (Same As) 2014-03-18 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.