HI SB2495 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Chairperson of the Board of Agriculture or their designee to annually notify all irrigation users by mail and conduct in-person visits on procedures to remove unused irrigation system water meters and stop acreage assessments. By an unspecified date, requires the Board of Agriculture to amend its administrative rules to require the Department of Agriculture to: maintain an active record of land occupiers within the boundaries of an irrigation district that have not applied for water service or water service connections as prospective consumers and have not drawn water without authorization; immediately discontinue service to a land occupier for non-use if there are no water toll charges for a period of more than two years; maintain records of all weir, water meter, and water flow measuring instrument readings taken; make individualized reading records available to land occupiers upon request; provide written notice to land occupiers whenever a weir, water meter, or water flow measuring instrument is removed by the Department for any reason and to cease any associated water toll charges and acreage assessments; establish a formal process for certain land occupiers to contest erroneous water toll charges and acreage assessments; and establish a formal process for land occupiers with outstanding water toll charges and acreage assessments to enter into a reasonable payment plan with the Department. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Water Metering.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2379) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Fevella. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL deferred the measure until 01-31-24 2:15PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |