HI SB2507 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes from civil service requirements employees performing services in University of Hawaii student or employee housing and certain personal services in privately financed leased or owned buildings.
Title
Relating To Civil Service.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee on LBT deferred the measure. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LBT/HRE, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2507&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2507_.HTM |