HI SB2515 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the authority for department heads to establish federally funded positions for special, research, and demonstration projects approved by the governor, subject to an unspecified cap. Requires Governor to submit an annual report. (SB2515 HD1)
Title
Relating To State Employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1421-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-20-18 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-20-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 204) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2630) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2417) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LBR, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |