HI SB2515 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the criminal offense of trespassing on critical electrical infrastructure property. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Penal Code.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 268) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3254) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2569) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |