HI SB2518 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Say voting no (2) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Say voting no (2) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the State Public Charter School Commission to assess fees to help offset its operating costs. Clarifies the legal status of an approved charter applicant. Makes various amendments to the charter school law for clarity and consistency. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2518 HD1)
Title
Education; Charter Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Say voting no (2) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2). |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1052-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ichiyama, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hanohano, Takai, Matsumoto. |
2014-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-17-14 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2014-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-17-14. |
2014-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 03-14-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 222) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2787) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2111) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Gabbard, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-14 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1745 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - Act 099, 6/18/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1200).