HI SB2523 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Judiciary to conduct a study to determine how to implement a program that provides free child care services to minor children of parties and witnesses who are attending court hearings in the First Circuit Family Court. Requires the Judiciary to submit a report to the Legislature. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Child Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2227) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 9:00AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |