HI SB2526 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Act 173, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1274).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Act 173, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1274).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Technology Services Consolidation Working Group to assist the Office of Enterprise Technology Services in working with certain state agencies to inventory and categorize the business criticality of each major state information technology system or data set and determine the appropriate data center or hosting facility requirements. Requires a report to the Legislature. Extends the working group's dissolution date to 6/30/2026. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Information Technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | Act 173, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1274). |
2024-07-03 | House | Act 173, on 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1274). |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 92-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 92-24). |
2024-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kitagawa, Chun, Kapela, Morikawa, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, McKelvey, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 10:20AM; Conference Room 016. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 774). |
2024-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Todd, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Chun, Kapela, Morikawa, Garcia. |
2024-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 690). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; McKelvey, Moriwaki Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2024-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 702). |
2024-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1829-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2024-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Lowen, Nakashima excused (5). |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1210-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) M. Mizuno, Quinlan, Todd. |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-13-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 142) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2908) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from LBT/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2708) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 3:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LBT/GVO, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Consolidated State Information Technology Data
ETS
Information Technology
Report
Safeguards
Technology Services Consolidation Working Group
ETS
Information Technology
Report
Safeguards
Technology Services Consolidation Working Group