HI SB2529 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a health care claims uniform reporting and evaluation task force to develop necessary policies and procedures to establish a health care claims uniform reporting and evaluation system, and to standardize third-party processing and payment of prescription drug claims. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2529 HD2)
Title
Hawaii Health Care Claims Uniform Reporting and Evaluation System; Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 852-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Cabanilla, Herkes, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Cabanilla, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Morita, Souki. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Tuesday, 03-16-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting no (0) and Berg, Keith-Agaran, Manahan, Takumi, Thielen excused (5). | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 727-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Belatti, Brower, Mizuno, Shimabukuro, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Bertram, Carroll. | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-09-10 10:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 34 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 188) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2454) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Fukunaga, Hee, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:05AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2252) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Sakamoto, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-10 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |