HI SB2533 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to CPN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows condominiums to be eligible for commercial property assessed financing.
Title
Relating To Commercial Property Assessed Financing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2801 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Act 041, 05/30/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2533&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2533_.HTM |