HI SB2546 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a maximum aggregate dollar amount of the certified high technology business investment tax credits that may be claimed in a taxable year. Requires a taxpayer claiming the credit to provide certain information and consent to allow the information to be made public. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2017.
Title
High Technology Business Investment Tax Credit; Maximum Claimable
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2546&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2546_.HTM |