HI SB2556 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines an "eligible utility-scale renewable energy project" for purposes of a renewable energy technologies income tax credit available to commercial solar energy systems. Clarifies the calculation of the renewable energy technologies income tax credit for commercial solar energy systems. Provides that the value of the renewable energy technologies income tax credit for eligible utility-scale renewable energy projects shall be based on the credit value and cap that are in effect as of 7/1/2020. Provides that an eligible utility-scale renewable energy project shall only be eligible if they have a power purchase agreement that is either approved by a decision or order by the Public Utilities Commission or has filed with, or is pending approval from, the Public Utilities Commission prior to 12/31/2019. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2690) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EET, CPH/WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |