HI SB2562 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Agriculture for the establishment and administration of the Agriculture Grant Program to support local food production in the State.
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2004) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2105 (Same As) 2018-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 10:05AM in conference room 224.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2562&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2562_.HTM |