HI SB2570 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Re-Referred to HMS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Re-Referred to HMS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the use of reasonable corporal punishment. Repeals the justification of use of force by parents, guardians, teachers, and persons otherwise entrusted with the care or supervision of a minor.
Title
Relating To Safe And Effective Discipline.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HMS, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1798 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2570&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2570_.HTM |