HI SB2573 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Re-Referred to AEN/HHS, CPN/EET.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Re-Referred to AEN/HHS, CPN/EET.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an owner or operator of a solid waste electric generating facility to ensure that each incinerator operating as part of the facility has implemented air pollution controls sufficient to limit the emissions of nitrogen oxides, mercury, dioxins, and other air pollutants specified by the Director of Health to not more than 45 parts per million for each air pollutant, measured on an average daily basis. Authorizes the Director of Health to specify lower emission limits by rule.
Title
Relating To Air Pollution Control.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/HHS, CPN/EET. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HHS, CPN. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Air Pollution
Air Pollution Controls
Department of Health
Emission Limits
Solid Waste Electric Generating Facilities
Air Pollution Controls
Department of Health
Emission Limits
Solid Waste Electric Generating Facilities
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2573&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2573_.HTM |