HI SB2579 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all state buildings being constructed on or after 7/1/2025 where a water fountain is required to have a water bottle filling station. Takes effect 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Bottle Filling Stations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2686) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-06-24 3:05PM; CR 225. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-01-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |