HI SB2594 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Pine voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-19 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Pine voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a residency requirement for households in a newly constructed or moderately or substantially rehabilitated housing project developed by a qualified person or firm in order for that person or firm to be considered to receive a general excise tax exemption. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2594 HD1)
Title
Affordable Housing; GET Exemption; Residency Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Pine voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8). | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 856-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Ito, C. Lee; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman, Herkes, Luke, Morita; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Chang, Sagum, Ching; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-17-10 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 215) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) One Day Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2411) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Chun Oakland, Hee, Hooser, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Tsutsui, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kidani; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2330) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Sakamoto, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: Kidani, Galuteria, Tsutsui ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Hemmings. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-10 1:20pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |