HI SB2617 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to WAL/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to WAL/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Legislative Reference Bureau to conduct a study and report on the forty-one states in the country that have enacted laws limiting the sale of real property to foreign individuals or entities, and how those laws and related constitutional precedents could inform demand-side regulations for the real estate market in Hawaii in favor of resident ownership, specifically owner-occupied resident ownership. Makes an appropriation. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Takes effect 7/1/2040. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Real Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to WAL/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 161) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3005) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 10:31AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Public notice requirement waived pursuant to Senate Rule 21. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPN/TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2639) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-13-24 3:00PM; CR 224. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-09-24 9:46AM; CR 229. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN/TCA, WAM/JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2542 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Expenditure Ceiling
Foreign Individuals or Entities
LRB
Prohibition
Purchase of Real Property
Report
Study
Expenditure Ceiling
Foreign Individuals or Entities
LRB
Prohibition
Purchase of Real Property
Report
Study